Jg Wentworth Originations Llc,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
against
Moonach, Bhavandeep,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Details for
Jg Wentworth Originations Llc v. Moonach, Bhavandeep
Case Events for
Jg Wentworth Originations Llc v. Moonach, Bhavandeep
Date
Type
Description
February 29, 2012
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/29/2012 09:00:00 AM .
February 29, 2012
Hearing
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion Heard
February 27, 2012
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
February 27, 2012
Docket Event
Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 31, 2012
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
January 31, 2012
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 10, 2012
Docket Event
Notice - Other (of continuance) filed.
January 09, 2012
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/09/2012 09:00:00 AM .
January 09, 2012
Docket Event
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/29/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
January 09, 2012
Hearing
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion Heard