Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lor, Yong Mee, Lor, Khaulee, Lo, Nor Cha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeffrey D Bohn, against Garcia, Filberto, Does 1-50, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time616 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 16, 2013Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2012-02-16T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2012-04-04T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Mee, Young rejected on 11/22/2011 .
Date: 2011-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Lor, Khau Lee rejected on 11/22/2011 .
Date: 2011-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Summons submitted by Lor, Khaulee; Mee, Young rejected on 01/09/2012 .
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00Summons submitted by Lor, Khaulee rejected on 01/31/2012 .
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-02-09T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2012-04-04T00:00:00Email correspondence
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: April 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.