Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Culliton, Mitchell Lane, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Todd M Friedman, against Select Financial Services, Inc., represented by Andrew M Steinheimer, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions465 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time512 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 21, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: November 14, 2011Summons filed.
Date: November 14, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: December 19, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: December 30, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.