Shenhav, Dikla,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Eugene L. Balonon presiding.
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: Eugene L. Balonon
February 17, 2012
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/17/2012 01:30:00 PM .
February 17, 2012
Docket Event
Decree Changing Name filed.
February 17, 2012
Docket Event
Petition for Change of Name has been Granted .
February 16, 2012
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion set on 02/17/2012 01:30:00 PM published .
February 07, 2012
Tentative Ruling
TENTATIVE RULING The petition for name change is granted.
Judge: Eugene L. Balonon
December 30, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/17/2012 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 14 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .