Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
North of the River Recreation and Park District vs. Saleh Ohmer Salim
On September 08, 2011 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 08, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
6 months and 17 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement filed. |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Settlement) filed. |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Pending Action) filed. |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 44 .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|