Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CACH LLC vs. Margarita Anglero
On September 02, 2011 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 02, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
7 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/08/2011 . | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed. |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 44 .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|