Duncan, Linda,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Russell L. Hom presiding.
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
October 14, 2011
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
September 30, 2011
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise heard on 09/30/2011 09:00:00 AM .
September 30, 2011
Docket Event
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
September 30, 2011
Hearing
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise Heard
Judge: Russell L. Hom
September 30, 2011
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .
September 30, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
September 12, 2011
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise scheduled for 09/30/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 22 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Russell L. Hom
September 02, 2011
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed.