Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Does 1-100, Palomares, Dionisio A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time101 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: September 06, 2011Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: October 07, 2011Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 16, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: September 06, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: October 06, 2011Proof of Service filed.
Date: October 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.