Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Linda Romero vs. Asadullah Ahmadzaa
On September 02, 2011 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 02, 2011
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Laurie M. Earl;Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 10 months and 26 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement filed. |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/10/2014 08:30am was vacated | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/05/2014 01:30pm was vacated | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed. |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/05/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated . | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/10/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated . | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (on Stipulation) filed. |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance of Trial filed. |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed. |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar restore to 07/26/2012 at 09:00:00 PM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 08/15/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date. | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 09/23/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed. |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 09/23/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 08/15/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar scheduled for 07/26/2012 at 09:00:00 PM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
March 29, 2012 | hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/29/2012 08:30:00 AM . |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Master Calendar Department for Parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days. | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of referral date. | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/29/2012 08:30:00 AM published . |
|
March 19, 2012 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is required under the following conditions: This matter is referred to the Trial Setting Process effective 07/26/2012 to allow discovery to be completed. The Plaintiff shall diligently p...
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 44 .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/02/2011 . | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|