Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew J Mackey, against Does 1 To 10, Elswick, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 14, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: May 31, 2011Summons filed.
Date: May 31, 2011Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: June 27, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: July 27, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.