Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert J Colclough, Iii, against Alla, Ferdinand O., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: November 26, 2012Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 16, 2012Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: September 23, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Request for Attorneys Fee) filed.
Date: September 23, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: May 16, 2012Declaration - Other (Pursuant to CCP 585d) filed.
Date: September 23, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.