Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bh Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenneth J Miele, against Does 1-5, Ferden, Carol L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions163 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: May 31, 2011Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 10, 2011Summons filed.
Date: May 31, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: July 25, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: July 12, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.