Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Paulsen, Barry A., Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time703 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: August 18, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: August 18, 2011Declaration - Other (First Declaration CCP 585 (a)) filed.
Date: August 18, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-07-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Second Declaration CCP 585 (a)) filed.
Date: August 18, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: August 18, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 03, 2013Writ of Execution Issued
Date: December 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.