Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sunlan-062804 Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenneth J Miele, against Does 1 To 5, Powers, Machelle D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time778 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: September 19, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: September 19, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration re accrued interest, attorney fes and costs) filed.
Date: September 19, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: September 19, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 13, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: December 29, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-09-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 17, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.