Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Crow Ii, Richard E., Sevey, Jack, Weninger, Joseph J., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Carl J Calnero, Douglas E Kirkman, against Britt, Donald S., Does 1-100, Gilbert, John D., The Crow Law Firm, Roes 1-20, (total of 6) See All represented by Donald S Britt, John D Fairbrook, Michael L Hanks, Whitney F Washburn, William R Warne, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1185 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1441 days |
Reply (Memorandum in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/17/2012 09:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2012-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Jack Sevey's Reply to Defendant Britt's Opp to Plaintiff Sevey's MIL #1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Appliction To Replace President) filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (- Redacted - in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Jack Sevey's Reply to Defendant Britt's Opp to Plaintiff Sevey's MIL #2) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Case Management Program heard on 08/31/2012 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2013-11-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/29/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2014-05-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/27/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2012-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (to Motion for Preference) filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Statement - Other (of non opp to def/x-def Donald S Britt's Motion to seal) filed.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/16/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-10-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/26/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-11-26T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Reply (To Motion to seal portions of Plantiffs Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Motion - Other (to amend the protective order) filed.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/15/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Stipulation filed.
Date: March 18, 2015Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (and protective order) filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-11-21T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2012-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (2n Amended) filed.
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Additional Responses to Request for Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Injunctive Relief) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-02-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-05-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Statement - Other (Separate statement) filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/23/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/13/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/12/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Jack Sevey's Reply to Defendant Gilbert's Opp to Plaintiff Sevey's MIL #1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Settlement Statement filed.
Date: 2014-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 08/17/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-08-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Allowing Plaintiffs to file First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/14/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Case Management Program set on 08/31/2012 01:30:00 PM published .
Date: 2012-08-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Donald B in support of Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Order: Stipulation for Sealing of Motion Documents
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (further responses of John D Gilber to jack Sevey's Special Interrogs) filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-11-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Suppl P&As in Supprt of Plntff Sevey MIL #1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Response (to John D Gilberts Evidentiary Objections) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/30/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint (Redacted version)) filed.
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Jack Sevey's Reply to John D. Gilbert's Opp to Jack Sevey's MIL #2) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (Redacted amended Notice of Motion for Injunctive Relief) filed.
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment (FIRST) filed.
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Reconsideration of Trial Setting Order) filed.
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities ((Redacted)) filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to extend time to file Motion to seal records) filed.
Date: 2013-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-11-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order To Extend Time To File Motion or Application To Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Reply to Opp...) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Seal Portions of Recent Filings) filed.
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Intent Not to File Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Answer (Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion in Limine - Civil Trial heard on 05/15/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS CROW AND WENINGER'S JOINDER IN JACK SEVEY'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRETT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of Recent Filings) filed.
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Settlement Statement filed.
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT BRITT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SEVEY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) filed.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Opposition (Joinder in Jack Sevey's Opp) filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion in Limine - Civil Trial heard on 05/09/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Order Regarding Access to and Disposition of Crow Law Firm Files and Records) filed.
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/18/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Intent to File Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/07/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to extend time to file Motion to seal records) filed.
Date: 2013-05-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Defendant and Cross-Defendant Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence) filed.
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order filed.
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Order Determining Depo) filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter Dropping Hearing Date of May 12, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Dept. 54) filed.
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Stip) filed.
Date: 2011-11-01T00:00:00Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (EFS-005) filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Temporary Restraining and/or Protective Orders) filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jack Sevey) filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jacob L Ouzts) filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (Purusant ot Cal Rule of Court 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Richard E Crow) filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Matthew G Jacobs) filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Donald S Britt) filed.
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of C Blaine) filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Undertaking filed.
Date: 2012-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jacob L Ouzts) filed.
Date: 2012-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (AMENDED) filed.
Date: 2012-05-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Correspondence (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel, 6/29/12) filed.
Date: 2012-06-15T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Redacted Copies of Four Documents to have filed under seal portions...) filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:0034-2012-00118406-CU-FR-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2011-00104236-CU-FR-GDS on 06/25/2012 .
Date: 2012-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2012-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition) filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2013-08-09T00:00:00Statement - Other (Redacted Copies of the Documents Party Seeks to Have Filed Under Seal) filed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Seal Portions of Recent Filings) filed.
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Opp) filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Objection (to Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Seal Portions of Documents) filed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2013-05-22T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Charles L Deem in opp to plaintiff Jack Sevey's Motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Trial Brief ([REDACTED]PLAINTIFFS CROW AND WENINGER'S INITIAL TRIAL BRIEF) filed.
Date: 2014-04-16T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Application to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 11, 21, 31, 41,51, and 61) filed.
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Special Interrogs) filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Statement - Other (Separate Statement) filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of David F Gross in opp to plaintiff Jack Sevey's Motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Intent not to File Motion to Seal) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Case Management Program heard on 05/09/2013 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2012-04-04T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Seal Portions of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Opposition (to John Gilbert's Motion to Re-Designate Consolidated Cases) filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2013-12-10T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (JOHN D. GILBERT'S OPPOSITION TO JACK SEVEY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) filed.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF CARL. J. CALNERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Case Management Program set on 05/09/2013 08:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2013-05-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) filed.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration filed.
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (redacted in support of motion for injunctive relief) filed.
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00Motion for Preference filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Non-Opposition (to plaintiff Jack Sevey's Motion for leave to file 1st amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Reply (PLNTFFs) filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Jack Sevey's Reply to Defendant Britt's Opp to Plaintiff Sevey's MIL #3) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Order of Dismissal
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Opposition (to plfs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena to JP Morgan Chase Bank) filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Motion - Other (To Seal portions of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT BRITT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SEVEY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) filed.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/24/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00Statement - Other (Supplemental Case Mgmt Statement) filed.
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/13/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by Crow, Richard E II rejected on 12/30/2011 .
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT BRITT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SEVEY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Statement - Other ((Redacted) Separate Statement in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Response (to Donald Britt's Objections) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT DONALD S. BRITT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Responses) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-08-24T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Opposition (JOHN D. GILBERT'S OPPOSITION TO JACK SEVEY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order To Extend Time to File Motion to Seal Records) filed.
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF CARL J. CALNERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/13/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-06-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-04-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opp) filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew W Kruse) filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jack Sevey) filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant to Cal Rule of Court Section 2.551 (b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Douglas Kirkman) filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant To Cal. Rule of Court Section 2.551(B)(3)) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Alexander M. Medina) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Notice - Other filed.
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Michael E Vinding) filed.
Date: 2012-12-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J. Calnero) filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of K Greg Peterson) filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Donald S Britt) filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J. Calnero) filed.
Date: 2013-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew G Jacobs) filed.
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant to CRC Section 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J Calnero) filed.
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J. Calnero) filed.
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 05/14/2013 08:53:00 AM .
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Richard E Crow) filed.
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant to Ca Rule of Court Section 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Whitney F. Washburn) filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John D. Gilbert) filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Martin N Jensen) filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Jury Fee Deposit) filed.
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Responses to Deposition Questioning) filed.
Date: 2012-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice Purs to CRC 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Order - Other (Order on Motion to Continue Motion for Injunction Relief and Strike) filed.
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (Prusuant to CRC 2.551 b 3) filed.
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John Gilbert) filed.
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant to CRC 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John D Fairbrook) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (pursuant to CRC 2.551b 3) filed.
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-01-31T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Permit the Subsequent Deposition of John Gilbert) filed.
Date: 2013-04-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jack Sevey) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (Purs to Cal Rule of Court Section) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Order After Hearing submitted by Britt, Donald S rejected on 10/25/2013 .
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar heard on 12/13/2013 03:28:00 PM .
Date: 2013-12-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) filed.
Date: 2014-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Appearance filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Order Granting Attorneys Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Trial OR for an OST) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Britt's Ex Parte Motion to continue trial) filed.
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Response (to Motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental - of William R Warne in Support of Motion to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 02/27/2014 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/19/2014 02:38:00 PM .
Date: 2014-03-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (Pursuant to CRC 2.551 (b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-03-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J Calnero) filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Certificate of Service) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Alexander M Medina) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Meghan M Baker) filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE PURSUANT TO CAL. RULE OF COURT SECTION 2.551(B)(3)) filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 04/18/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00NON-PARTY WITNESS SCHEDULING AND ISSUES
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 04/04/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Bridget A Sanders) filed.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Reply (Brief in support of Moton to Quash Deposition Subpoena) filed.
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carl J Calnero) filed.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew G Jacobs) filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental declaration of Matthew G Jacobs) filed.
Date: 2013-12-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of David A Cheit) filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Donald S Britt) filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Alexander M Medina) filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter Dropping Hearing Date of June 3, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Dept. 54) filed.
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Decl of C.Calnero in Supprt of Suppl P&As in Supprt of Plntff Sevey MIL #1) filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLNTFFs) filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Exhibit List (Def GILBERTs List of Exhibits) filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Def BRITT Proposed) filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Exhibit List (Def BRITTs Exh List) filed.
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 06/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-06-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 07/10/2014 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice pursuant to Cal. Rule of Court Section 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice Pursuant to Cal. Rule of Court Section 2.55(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice Pursuant To Cal. Rule of Courts Section 2.551(b)(3)) filed.
Date: 2014-07-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 07/23/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-07-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 08/08/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 08/28/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Court Reporter's Transcripts of Proceedings Status Conference July 10, 2014..Reported by Valerie Haley
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE PURSUANT TO CAL. RULE OF COURT SECTION 2.551(B)(3)) filed.
Date: 2014-04-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Megan M Baker) filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal from Representation) filed.
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Continued Hearing) filed.
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: April 02, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.