Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Filed By: Whalen, Michael, Whalen, Michael, Whalen, Teresa, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Peter F Samuel, against Ahn, Lara, Does 1 To 25, Gouveia, Sarmento, Gouveia, Sonia, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Kenneth N. Brody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 17, 2011 |
Category(Other Personal Injury/Propert...) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions179 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time721 days |
This is a Complaint for Personal Injuries. The plaintiffs, Michael Whalen and Teresa Whalen, allege a negligence cause of action, a strict liability cause of action, a premises liability cause of action, a negligent infliction of emotional distress c...
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 06, 2011Notice
Date: September 15, 2011Answer
Date: April 28, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 17, 2011Complaint
Date: March 17, 2011Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 28, 2011Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 02, 2011Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 07, 2013Summons
Date: March 17, 2011Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order
Date: May 19, 2011Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 12, 2011Notice
Date: December 28, 2012Notice
Date: October 28, 2011Notice
Date: October 18, 2012Arbitration Award
Date: January 31, 2012Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 21, 2011Notice
Date: October 30, 2012Notice
Date: October 21, 2011Qualification Statement
Date: October 28, 2011Judgment
Date: June 19, 2012Minute Order
Date: October 06, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: October 03, 2011Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 31, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2011[mche] Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: October 24, 2011[mche] Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading (Granted)
Date: June 09, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 12, 2011Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 02, 2011Abstract of Judgment submitted by Whalen, Michael rejected on 12/28/2012 .
Date: December 28, 2012Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: May 02, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 07, 2013Answer filed.
Date: April 28, 2011Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: October 12, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 21, 2011Qualification Statement filed.
Date: October 28, 2011Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: October 31, 2011Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: October 24, 2011Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: January 31, 2012Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: September 12, 2011Judgment on Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: June 19, 2012Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: April 28, 2011Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading (Granted)
Date: June 09, 2011Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: October 28, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: March 17, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default submitted by Whalen, Teresa rejected on 09/15/2011 .
Date: September 15, 2011Abstract of Judgment submitted by Whalen, Michael; Whalen, Teresa rejected on 10/30/2012 .
Date: October 30, 2012Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: October 21, 2011Abstract of Judgment submitted by Whalen, Teresa rejected on 10/18/2012 .
Date: October 18, 2012Abstract of Judgment submitted by Whalen, Michael rejected on 10/18/2012 .
Date: October 18, 2012Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: June 06, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: March 17, 2011Certificate of Service filed.
Date: June 06, 2011Summons filed.
Date: March 17, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2021 |
This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program. | |
January 12, 2020 |
This case is reassigned from department 23 to department 43 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
January 21, 2018 |
This case is reassigned from department 30 to department 23 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
January 17, 2016 |
This case is reassigned from department 39 to department 30 for Case Management Program effective 01/17/2016. Case |
||
March 07, 2013 |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Document |
||
March 07, 2013 |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Filed By: Whalen, Michael (Plaintiff); Whalen, Teresa (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 07, 2013 |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Whalen, Michael (Plaintiff); Whalen, Teresa (Plaintiff) |
||
March 07, 2013 | RECEIPT | ||
March 07, 2013 |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.