Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gosal, Kamaljit, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by S David Rosenthal, against Diaz, Trinidad Guzman, Does 1-30, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1355 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1365 days |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 04/15/2014 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2014-04-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 04, 2014Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/15/2014 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Request - Other filed.
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed.
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-02-23T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: November 14, 2014Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-11-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of S David Rosenthal) filed.
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Order - Other (Clerk's Return Document Letter) filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of David Hirshik) filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: June 03, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.