Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Andrew W Schwartz, against Valley Bluegrass Inc, The Siddiqui Family Partnership, The Regents Of The University Of California, Siddiqui, Javed T., Siddiqui, Amna J., (total of 10) See All represented by Scott E Jenny, David M Robinson, Ralph R Nevis, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Cycle Time1245 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other filed.
Date: April 10, 2014Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/15/2011 09:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Order - Other (Partial Judgment of Condemnation re: Regents of the University of California) filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Request - Other (Demand for Exchange of List of Expert Witnesses) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/15/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2011-12-23T00:00:00Request - Other (Demand to exchange Lists of Expert Witnesses and statements of valuation data) filed.
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Single Assignment for All Purposes) filed.
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Valuation Data) filed.
Date: 2013-05-08T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Re Revised Acquisition Description & Platt) filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed.
Date: 2011-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of order) filed.
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-02-22T00:00:00Order - Other (on Stipulation for Entry of Amended Partial Judgment re the Regents) filed.
Date: October 25, 2013Order - Other (Final Order of Condemnation) filed.
Date: April 29, 2014Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Orders) filed.
Date: 2012-02-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/21/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (Re Settlement and Dismissal Without Prejudice) filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: March 24, 2014Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: April 10, 2014Notice of Entry - Other (of Partial Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Deposit) filed.
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed.
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-16T00:00:00Disclaimer filed.
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-23T00:00:00Motion - Other (for order of possession) filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order for Withdrawal of Deposit) filed.
Date: 2011-03-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Order - Other (Order for Possession) filed.
Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order Of Possession) filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Disclaimer filed.
Date: 2011-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Select Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed.
Date: 2012-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar heard on 01/25/2012 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/25/2012 03:10:00 PM .
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 03/15/2012 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Order - Other (on Stipulation to Continue Trial and MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order to Continue Trial and MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2013-05-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.