State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Rocchi, Paul E.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Rocchi, Paul E.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Rocchi, Paul E.
Date
Type
Description
April 10, 2014
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
November 07, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
May 21, 2013
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 14, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 22, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
May 24, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .