State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Salamca, Felimon,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Salamca, Felimon
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Salamca, Felimon
Date
Type
Description
May 25, 2018
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
June 18, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 27, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 19, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .