State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Cremer, Crystal D.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Cremer, Crystal D.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Cremer, Crystal D.
Date
Type
Description
April 05, 2019
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
April 05, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 25, 2018
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 21, 2017
Docket Event
Order - Other (Order on Claim of Exemption) filed.
August 21, 2017
Hearing
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion Heard
August 21, 2017
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .
July 26, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
July 21, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
July 21, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.