Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Mcqueary, Dale L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Marjorie Koller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarjorie Koller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2750 days |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: August 12, 2011Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 14, 2011Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: 2011-04-20T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2011-07-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: 2011-07-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 15, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.