State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Hulsey Sr., Steven D.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Hulsey Sr., Steven D.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Hulsey Sr., Steven D.
Date
Type
Description
October 31, 2013
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
July 18, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
February 28, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
December 05, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 21, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 24, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .