State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Dimas, Agustin,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Dimas, Agustin
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Dimas, Agustin
Date
Type
Description
October 21, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
September 14, 2015
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 24, 2013
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
March 11, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 22, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .