State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Marez, Lupe B.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Marez, Lupe B.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Marez, Lupe B.
Date
Type
Description
July 30, 2018
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
March 09, 2018
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 13, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 20, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
December 15, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 27, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
October 25, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .