State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Juarez, Christop,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Juarez, Christop
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Juarez, Christop
Date
Type
Description
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
July 06, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 09, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 07, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .