State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Arteaga, Angelica,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Arteaga, Angelica
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Arteaga, Angelica
Date
Type
Description
October 13, 2015
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
May 21, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
February 02, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 06, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .