State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Smith, Jakinah D.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Smith, Jakinah D.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Smith, Jakinah D.
Date
Type
Description
June 19, 2014
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
March 21, 2014
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
June 21, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 26, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .