Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Slown, Kenneth J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1138 days |
Ex Parte Application - Other (Application To Vacate Judgment) filed.
Date: December 20, 2012Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 07, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: September 12, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: September 13, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.