State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Austria, Alexander V.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Austria, Alexander V.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Austria, Alexander V.
Date
Type
Description
November 04, 2013
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
July 29, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
December 13, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 15, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
November 04, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
April 01, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
December 31, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.