State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Schaffter, Matthew D.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Schaffter, Matthew D.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Schaffter, Matthew D.
Date
Type
Description
December 11, 2015
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
August 14, 2014
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
July 15, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
April 09, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
March 16, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 30, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
April 30, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
February 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
February 26, 2010
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
February 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k filed.