Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Macklin, Milton, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions582 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1518 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2011-02-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: August 03, 2012Trial Brief filed.
Date: August 03, 2012Judgment filed.
Date: August 03, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Memo of Costs (not posted - Costs already delineated in body of entered Judgment)
Date: September 10, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied) filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Certification for Short Cause Matters filed.
Date: 2012-03-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: August 03, 2012Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 02, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: February 25, 2015Proof of Service filed.
Date: October 15, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.