Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Costello, John J., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3172 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 17, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution (San Bernardino) Issued
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 17, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 08/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: August 21, 2019Order - Other (Amended Order on Claim of Exemption Hearing) filed.
Date: September 06, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.