Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Ramos, Marcos, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions473 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time874 days |
Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 16, 2012Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: April 16, 2012Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.
Date: April 16, 2012Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: September 20, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 22, 2013Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: April 16, 2012Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: November 05, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.