Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Abouelkheir, Ahmad A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time497 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 01, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: April 01, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Judgment by Default Pursuant to CCP 1033) filed.
Date: April 01, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: May 10, 2012Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-16T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: September 12, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.