Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Does 1-25, Delgado, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 10, 2011Summons filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: January 24, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: January 31, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.