Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael R Boulanger, against Does 1-15, Vue, Thomas D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Acquisto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Acquisto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3063 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: September 30, 2011Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 30, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: September 30, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: September 30, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-07-15T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (reimbursment of costs) filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (waiver of atty fees) filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 13, 2016Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO) Issued
Date: October 05, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 20, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.