Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ibew Members Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Buennagel, against Does 1-10, Robinson, Kenneth R., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time512 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 15, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 25, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Support of Request for entry of Clerks Judgment) filed.
Date: March 15, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 15, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: May 24, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: July 07, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 07, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: May 24, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.