Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Katzenstein, Deanne, Giannola, Nicholas Robert Malvini, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Declaration - Other (Deanne M Katzenstein in support of petition) filed.
Date: March 30, 2011Order - Other (Order to Show Cause for Change of Name) filed.
Date: 2011-01-03T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver: Granted
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: January 27, 2011Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: April 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.