Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-10, Hutchings, Byron D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time984 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: June 14, 2012Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in lieu of testimony) filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-07T00:00:00Returned Document (Court Judgment) Rejected
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: November 28, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 11, 2013Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: September 09, 2013Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 28, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.