Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Escobar, Berta, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by David C Rancano, against Eskaton Properties Inc, Does 1-100, represented by David L. Ditora, Jeffery Owensby, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions853 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time861 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-15T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Response to its Req for Prod of Docs...) filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-12-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (to plfs objections to evidence) filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed.
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion filed.
Date: 2012-12-12T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-02-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (plfs volume of evidence in opposition to defs motion for summary judgment) filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Allowing Def to File P & A's in Excess of Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Response filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Opposition (to plfs notion to amend complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2013-03-15T00:00:00Correspondence (Notice of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/12/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/10/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Betsy Donovan) filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of David L Ditora) filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Patricia Bayless) filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Angie Tritz) filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Index of Exhibits) filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of David C Rancano) filed.
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2012-11-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Berta Escobar) filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Violeta Diaz) filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Lupe Mejia) filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of J Michael Hopper) filed.
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Ken Van Arsdel) filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Amendment filed.
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 11, 2013Correspondence filed.
Date: April 19, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.