Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
1St Financial Bank Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Does 1-10, Ruggerio, Jenny, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1005 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2687 days |
Judgment (Judgment on Stipulation) filed.
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Proposed Order (determing claim of exemption) filed.
Date: October 30, 2015Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: October 30, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: October 30, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Declaration of Default or Non-Compliance re: Stipulated Agreement filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Placer) Issued
Date: September 01, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 19, 2018Order - Other (Order Claim of Exemption Hearing) filed.
Date: December 01, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.