Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
United Auto Credit Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by F J Donehue, against Zanetta, Noah Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions238 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1677 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Rejection Letter(Court Judgment)Rejected
Date: 2012-08-13T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 14, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-06-14T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: February 24, 2014Declaration - Other (of Lost Original) filed.
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Returned Document(Court Judgment) Rejected
Date: 2012-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Judgment (Default Judgment) filed.
Date: November 05, 2013Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: August 12, 2013Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Default denied as to Zanetta, Noah Antonio on Complaint .
Date: 2011-06-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Under CCP 585d in Support of Entry of Default Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 24, 2014Default denied as to Zanetta, Noah Antonio on Complaint .
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 28, 2013Declaration - Other (Declaration Under CCP 585(d) In Support Of Entry Of Default Judgment) filed.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 13, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.