Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Timothy Krantz, against Pena, Editha, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 16, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: March 18, 2011Notice on Hearing About Court Fees
Date: 2011-02-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver: Denied
Date: 2011-02-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Court Fee Waiver - Civil Fee Waiver heard on 03/18/2011 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.