Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does 1-10, Hunt, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3087 days |
Declaration - Other (Statement Of Account On Account Stated.) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Assignment) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Rory W. Clark RE: Interest Computation) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Rory W. Clark Pursuant To C.C.P. Section 1033) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: August 19, 2011Writ of Execution submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 04/30/2012 .
Date: April 30, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 19, 2013Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: October 12, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 24, 2019Writ of Execution (LA) Issued
Date: May 25, 2012Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: October 01, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.