Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Well Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does I-X, Martha E Martin As Co-Trustee, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions256 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time270 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 23, 2011Amended Complaint filed.
Date: May 31, 2011Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: September 06, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: February 14, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: August 09, 2011Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: June 07, 2011Summons filed.
Date: May 31, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.