Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does I - X, Mccammond, Glynda, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions180 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3120 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: June 07, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: June 07, 2011Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Information) filed.
Date: May 24, 2019Declaration - Other (pursuant to CCP 1033) filed.
Date: June 07, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: June 07, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-06-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 12, 2011Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: June 25, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.