Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Frame, David, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Robert W Hunt, against Nunez, Helen, Military Personnel Services Corporation, Does 1-50, California National Guard, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time326 days |
Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: April 28, 2011Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: May 16, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 02, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Court to retain Jurisdiction to Cal Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6) filed. | |
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Frame, David rejected on 10/19/2011 . | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. | |
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement filed. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.