Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does 1-10, Escorcia, Betty, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions214 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re interest computation) filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 02, 2012Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: August 23, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 22, 2013Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: June 29, 2015Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: May 02, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 06, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.