Seneca One Llc,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Notice of Entry - Other (of order approving transfer of structured settlement payment rights) filed.
January 21, 2011
Docket Event
Order - Other (Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.
January 19, 2011
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/19/2011 09:00:00 AM .
January 19, 2011
Hearing
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/19/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
December 22, 2010
Docket Event
Motion - Other (Notice of hearing on petn for approval of transfer of structured settlement pmt rights) filed.
December 09, 2010
Docket Event
Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.